IL HB1776 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0201
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of the introduced bill with the following change. Adds hospitals with a pediatric or adolescent inpatient psychiatric unit to the type of hospitals that the Department of Children and Family Services is required to pay the DCFS per diem rate for inpatient psychiatric stays.
Title
DCFS RATE-PSYCHIATRIC STAYS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0201 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date July 30, 2021 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-001 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Murphy |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2021-03-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-03-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Appropriations-Human Services Committee; 020-000-000 |
2021-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Appropriations-Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-03-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-03-10 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-03-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Human Services Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-02-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Greg Harris |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 5-5.07 | Amended Code | Citation Text |