IL HB1776 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-11)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-11)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Election Code. Provides for the election of the board of trustees of the City Colleges of Chicago, Illinois Community College District No. 508, at the general primary election in 2018 on a nonpartisan ballot. Provides that a member of the board of trustees shall be elected at each consolidated election thereafter. Makes related changes. Amends the Public Community College Act. Sets forth provisions concerning nominating petitions and ballots. Provides that the City of Chicago shall be subdivided into 20 trustee districts by the General Assembly for seats on the board of trustees, in addition to one at-large trustee. Provides that in the year following each decennial census, the General Assembly shall redistrict the trustee districts to reflect the results of each decennial census. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
COM COL-CHICAGO-ELECT BOARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2019-01-06 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Assigned to Higher Education |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Kwame Raoul |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2017-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2017-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-003-000 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-04-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton |
2017-03-16 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-15 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Higher Education Committee; 019-000-000 |
2017-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2017-03-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert W. Pritchard |
2017-03-06 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Cynthia Soto |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brandon W. Phelps |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr. |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chad Hays |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2017-02-24 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2017-02-23 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to Higher Education Committee |
2017-02-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2017-02-09 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Robert Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 5 | 2A-1.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
10 | 5 | 2A-52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 7-2.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
110 | 805 | 7-3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |