IL HB1773 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall examine every licensed driver at least every 16 (rather than 8) years. Provides that except as otherwise provided in the Code, every driver's license issued under the Code shall expire 8 (rather than 4) years from the date of issuance. Removes a provision allowing the Secretary to issue to a person not previously licensed as a driver in Illinois a driver's license which will expire not less than 4 years and not more than 5 years from the date of issuance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-LICENSE-EXPIRATION

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2017-03-31HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-02-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-22HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-02-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith R. Wheeler
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-02-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Peter Breen

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62556-109Amended CodeCitation Text
62556-115Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback