IL HB1772 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0044
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004. Provides that the requirement for licensure that an applicant must submit certification issued by the Department of State Police that the applicant's fingerprinting equipment and software meets all specifications required by the Department of State Police applies to fingerprint vendor agencies (rather than fingerprint vendors), and that the requirement is a continuing requirement for licensure. Adds as a qualification for licensure as a fingerprint vendor that an applicant provides proof of compliance with the Department fingerprinting equipment and software specifications if the applicant is not required to obtain a fingerprint vendor agency license under the Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINGERPRINT VENDOR EQUIP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-11HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0044
2017-08-11HouseEffective Date August 11, 2017
2017-08-11HouseGovernor Approved
2017-06-13HouseSent to the Governor
2017-05-15HousePassed Both Houses
2017-05-15SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 15, 2017
2017-05-12SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-04SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 5, 2017
2017-05-04SenateDo Pass Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions
2017-03-16SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-03-16SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-16SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Jason A. Barickman
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-03-16SenateArrive in Senate
2017-03-15HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-001
2017-03-09HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lindsay Parkhurst
2017-03-08HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2017-03-08HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-08HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Police & First Responders Committee; 013-000-000
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to Police & First Responders Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Brian W. Stewart

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
22544731-10Amended CodeCitation Text
22544731-15Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback