IL HB1770 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-04 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Amends various Acts to make conforming changes. Effective January 1, 2022.
Title
FIREARM OWNERS ID ACT-REPEAL
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-04 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David A. Welter |
2022-02-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2022-01-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Luft |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain |
2021-03-18 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Swanson |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Blaine Wilhour |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Chris Miller |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Elik |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas M. Bennett |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joe Sosnowski |
2021-02-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1770&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1770.htm |