IL HB1758 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-07-05 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the State Board of Education shall establish a grant program to provide for armed security in the schools of this State and grants to schools for the training of teachers in armed security, including grants for teachers to obtain a concealed carry license under the Firearm Concealed Carry Act. Amends the Firearm Concealed Carry Act and the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that the unlawful use of weapons offense does not apply to carrying a concealed pistol, revolver, or handgun by a full-time teacher or full-time professor or administrator of a public or private school, community college, college, or university who has a valid concealed carry license issued under the Firearm Concealed Carry Act and who has been designated by his or her school district board or the board of trustees of his or her community college, college, or university as a school or college protection officer, into: (1) any building, real property, and parking area under the control of the public or private elementary or secondary school in which the person is employed; or (2) any building, classroom, laboratory, medical clinic, hospital, artistic venue, athletic venue, entertainment venue, officially recognized university-related organization property, whether owned or leased, and any real property, including parking areas, sidewalks, and common areas under the control of a public or private community college, college, or university in which the person is employed. Effective immediately.
Title
SCHOOL SECURITY-ARMED TEACHERS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-05 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Adam Niemerg |
2021-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David Friess |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 2-3.182 | New Code | See Bill Text |
430 | 66 | 65 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 24-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1758&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HB/10200HB1758.htm |