IL HB1747 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-23 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Provides that beginning June 1, 2022, alternative retail electric suppliers may procure renewable energy resources from a renewable energy generator located in Illinois for self-directing retail customers. Sets forth qualifications to be a self-directing retail customer. Provides for the duration of self-supply renewable portfolio standard agreements. Provides that an electric utility shall include an additional separate line item credit on the monthly bills of self-directing retail customers to fully rebate to self-directing retail customers the costs associated with the purchase of renewable energy resources. Provides that an electric utility shall not procure renewable energy resources for self-directing retail customers. Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Provides that all renewable energy credits procured by alternative retail electric suppliers under the terms of self-supply renewable portfolio standard agreements, shall be used to meet the goals set forth in the long-term renewable resources procurement plan for the delivery year. Defines terms.
Title
UTILITIES-IMPORTS&EXPORTS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-21 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-22 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Public Utilities Committee; 025-000-000 |
2021-03-22 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Public Utilities Committee; by Voice Vote |
2021-03-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-03-18 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Public Utilities Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Public Utilities Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |