IL HB1746 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0199
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that each school board must (rather than may) appoint at least one employee to act as a liaison to facilitate enrollment and transfer of records of students in the legal custody of the Department of Children and Family Services. Provides that a school district is required (rather than encouraged) to designate a liaison by the beginning of the 2022-2023 school year. Provides that, for any student who is in the legal custody of the Department of Children and Family Services, the liaison must inform the Department's Office of Education and Transition Services of a parent-teacher conference or any other meeting concerning the student that would otherwise involve a parent and must, at the option of the caseworker, allow the student's caseworker to attend the conference or meeting. Amends the Illinois School Student Records Act. Provides that if a student is in the legal custody of the Department of Children and Family Services, the Department's Office of Education and Transition Services must be informed before a school student record is destroyed or any information in that record is deleted and shall have the right to inspect and copy all school student permanent and temporary records. Makes related changes. Effective July 1, 2022.
Title
STUDENT RECORD/CONFERENCE-DCFS
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Hoffman [D] | Rep. Carol Ammons [D] | Rep. Sue Scherer [D] | Sen. Julie Morrison [D] |
Sen. Patricia Van Pelt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-30 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0199 |
2021-07-30 | House | Effective Date July 1, 2022 |
2021-07-30 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-23 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** May 25, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Health; 014-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Health |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 10 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 10 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 10 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-20.59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 10-20.73 | New Code | See Bill Text |
105 | 5 | 10-21.8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 13B-60.10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 14-8.02 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.52 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 5 | 34-18.67 | New Code | See Bill Text |