IL HB1737 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-30 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-30 - Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Toll Highway Act. Provides that the Toll Highway Authority may not enter into any contract relating to the ownership or use of real property unless the identity of every owner and beneficiary having any interest in the property and every member, shareholder, limited partner, or general partner entitled to receive more than 7.5% of the total distributable income of any limited liability company, corporation, or limited partnership having any interest in the property is disclosed. Deletes provisions related to: condemnation proceedings; beneficial interests; and written statements. Provides that the Authority must file the statement of record with the recorder of each county in which any part of the land is located within 7 (rather than 3) business days after the statement is filed with the Authority.
Title
TOLL HIGHWAY-LAND DISCLOSURE
Sponsors
Rep. Marcus Evans [D] | Sen. Don Harmon [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2021-05-29 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 29, 2021 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John Connor |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 10 | 9.12 | Amended Code | Citation Text |