IL HB1726 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-06 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0278
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Fair Act, the Illinois Promotion Act, the Department of Human Services Act, the State Finance Act, the Illinois Income Tax Act, the Illinois Estate and Generation-Skipping Transfer Tax Act, the Liquor Control Act of 1934, the Clerks of Courts Act, the Criminal and Traffic Assessment Act, and the Unified Code of Corrections to make various technical corrections. Repeals obsolete Sections of the Department of Public Health Powers and Duties Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois and the State Finance Act. Repeals the Nursing Home Grant Assistance Act. Effective immediately.
Title
BUDGET RESULTS-CLEANUP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-06 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0278 |
2021-08-06 | House | Effective Date August 6, 2021 |
2021-08-06 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2021-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2021-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. William Davis |
2021-05-26 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Harris |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt State Government; 009-000-000 |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2021 |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 006-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 117-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1305 | 10-6 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 210 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2310 | 2310-358 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
20 | 665 | 4b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
235 | 5 | 1-3.37 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.599 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.72 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.748 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6w | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 8k | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
305 | 40 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
35 | 405 | 13 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 507AA | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 507BB | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 507DDD | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 5 | 507TT | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
705 | 105 | 27.1b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 135 | 15-20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-9-1.22 | Amended Code | Citation Text |