IL HB1725 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-13 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0346
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Requires trustees of schools in Class II county school units to maintain an Internet website on which specified information shall be available for public viewing. Requires township school treasurers in Class II county school units to submit to each school district that they serve, within 30 days after the end of each calendar quarter, an investments report that includes specified information. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH CD-TRUSTEES OF SCHOOL INFO
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-13 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0346 |
2021-08-13 | House | Effective Date August 13, 2021 |
2021-08-13 | House | Governor Approved |
2021-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Withdrawn by Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 13, 2021 |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Do Pass Education; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-05-04 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-27 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-001-000 |
2021-04-16 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-04-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-03-18 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-03-17 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools; 008-000-000 |
2021-03-09 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: Administration, Licensing & Charter Schools |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. William Davis |