IL HB1716 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Radiation Protection Act of 1990 from January 1, 2022 to January 1, 2032. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RADIATION PROTECTION-SUNSET

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-03-09HouseAssigned to Energy & Environment Committee
2021-02-17HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-02-17HouseFirst Reading
2021-02-11HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jawaharial Williams

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5804.32Amended CodeCitation Text
5804.41New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback