IL HB1677 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-13)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Assigned to Transportation
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning registration plates and stickers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRANSPORTATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-04-07HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 009-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lawrence Walsh, Jr.
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven A. Andersson
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Martwick
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Sente
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ryan Spain
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Lee Long
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2017-03-22HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John C. D'Amico
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2017-03-22HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-21HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-03-21HouseAssigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee
2017-03-20HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
62553-412Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback