IL HB1671 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-8)
Status: Enrolled on May 22 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-05-22 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Animal Control Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning rabies inoculations.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ANIMALS-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-22HousePassed Both Houses
2018-05-22SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2018-05-22SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Linda Holmes
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2018-05-10SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 15, 2018
2018-05-10SenateDo Pass State Government; 006-000-000
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-01SenateAssigned to State Government
2018-04-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Julie A. Morrison
2018-04-23SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-04-23SenateFirst Reading
2018-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-20HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 102-000-000
2018-04-20HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2018-04-18HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-18HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-18HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Dave Severin
2018-04-13HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 017-000-000
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sheri Jesiel
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Wojcicki Jimenez
2018-04-12HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Agriculture & Conservation Committee
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Monica Bristow
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Nick Sauer
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Carol Sente
2018-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-05HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Sente
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51058Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback