IL HB1664 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Firearm Owners Identification Card Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning a legislative declaration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFETY-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-02-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-02-28HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-005-000
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-02-27HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-02-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-02-26HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-02-26HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-02-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
430651Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback