IL HB1657 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Cigarette Fire Safety Standard Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SAFETY-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-28HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2017-05-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
42581Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback