IL HB1652 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0240
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Departments of State Government Law. Provides that expedited temporary occupational or professional licenses issued to service members and the spouses of service members meeting specified requirements shall be valid for 3 years (currently, valid 6 months) after the date of issuance or until a license is granted or a notice to deny a license is issued in accordance with rules adopted by the department issuing the license, whichever occurs first. Provides that the required fee paid in the application process for an expedited temporary occupational or professional license issued to service members and the spouses of service members shall be refundable (currently, not refundable).

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SERVICE MEMBER-EXPEDITED LIC

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0240
2019-08-09HouseEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-09HouseGovernor Approved
2019-06-25HouseSent to the Governor
2019-05-29HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-29HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-29HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
2019-05-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000
2019-05-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-26HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-21HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-21HouseArrived in House
2019-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 055-000-000
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-14SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Licensed Activities; 007-000-000
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-02SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Licensed Activities
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Licensed Activities
2019-04-12SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-04-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 008-000-000
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 4 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-08HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-04-01HouseChief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-01HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-04-01HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40
2019-03-27HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 014-000-000
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Health Care Licenses Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-20HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-12HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-03-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-07HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Jay Hoffman
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Health Care Licenses Committee
2019-02-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2055-715Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1652&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1652.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1652eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1652enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/101/101-0240.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1652ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1652ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1652ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1652ham004.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1652sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB1652_04112019_041000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB1652_05212019_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB1652sam001_05292019_027000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback