IL HB1639 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Counties Code. Creates the Coroner Standards and Reorganization Task Force. Provides for the appointment of 9 members to the Task Force. Includes provisions relating to Task Force membership, meetings, duties to evaluate different aspects concerning coroners in Illinois, and reports to the Governor and General Assembly. Provides that the Coroner Training Board shall provide administrative and other support to the Task Force. Provides that the Task Force is dissolved on January 1, 2025. Repeals the provisions on January 1, 2026. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

COUNTIES CD-CORONER TASK FORCE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2025-01-07HouseSession Sine Die
2023-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2023-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5553-3046New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback