IL HB1635 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Regulatory Sunset Act. Extends the repeal of the Medical Practice Act of 1987 from December 31, 2019 to December 31, 2029. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

MEDICAL PRACTICE ACT-SUNSET

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael P. McAuliffe
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anna Moeller

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5804.29Repealed CodeCitation Text
5804.39Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback