IL HB1630 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Local Government Bankruptcy Neutral Evaluation Act. Makes legislative findings. Defines terms. Authorizes a local public entity to initiate a neutral evaluation process if that entity is unable to meet its financial obligations. Provides for the selection and qualification of an evaluator, the evaluation process, cessation of an evaluation, declaration of a fiscal emergency, and definition of liabilities. Provides that records prepared for or used in connection with the Local Government Bankruptcy Neutral Evaluation Act are exempt from disclosure. Amends the Open Meetings Act. Provides that a public body may hold closed meetings related to the Local Government Bankruptcy Neutral Evaluation Act. Amends the Freedom of Information Act. Makes conforming changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOCAL GOV BANKRUPTCY NEUT EVAL

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-27HouseTo Local Government Subcommittee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Cities & Villages Committee
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
51202Amended CodeCitation Text
51407.5Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback