IL HB1620 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-11)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-11)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning use of tax moneys.
Title
TRANSPORTATION-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 012-006-000 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2018 |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018 |
2018-05-30 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-003-003 |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang |
2018-04-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-11 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Tollway Oversight Committee; 003-002-000 |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne |
2018-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tollway Oversight Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-03-28 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
605 | 5 | 5-701 | Amended Code | Citation Text |