IL HB1620 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-11)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-31 - Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Highway Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning use of tax moneys.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRANSPORTATION-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-31SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2018-05-31SenateDo Pass Transportation; 012-006-000
2018-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As December 31, 2018
2018-05-31SenateWaive Posting Notice
2018-05-31SenateAssigned to Transportation
2018-05-31SenateRule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2018
2018-05-30SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-26HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-003-003
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Brian W. Stewart
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-18HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Lou Lang
2018-04-12HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Scott Drury
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Tollway Oversight Committee; 003-002-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David Harris
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K Smith
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Gregory Harris
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie Phelps Finnie
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. John Connor
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Reginald Phillips
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Wheeler
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jerry Costello, II
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David S. Olsen
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Avery Bourne
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Tollway Oversight Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2018-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-03-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
60555-701Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback