IL HB1613 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 21 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Deletes language providing that the Section concerning the traffic and pedestrian stop statistical study is repealed on July 1, 2019. Provides that the Department of Transportation shall report specified findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on March 1, 2022 (rather than March 1, 2004). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

TRAFFIC/PEDESTRIAN STOP STUDY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 32 N: 18 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 75 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-21SenateThird Reading - Passed; 032-018-000
2019-05-15SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass Criminal Law; 006-004-000
2019-05-02SenatePostponed - Criminal Law
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-11SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr.
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Standard Debate - Passed 075-035-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Standard Debate
2019-04-11HouseRemoved from Short Debate Status
2019-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-04-10HouseRemove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-003-000
2019-04-09HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-29HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-03-06HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-03-04HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-01HouseFiscal Note Filed
2019-02-28HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-02-27HouseFiscal Note Requested by Rep. Tom Demmer
2019-02-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2019-02-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 012-005-001
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-02-26HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Justin Slaughter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625511-212Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback