IL HB1612 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-08-02 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code and the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that county or municipality may not prohibit a private homeowner from gardening on his or her property. Limits home rule powers. Effective immediately.
Title
COUNTY-MUNI-GARDENING ZONING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | To Local Government Subcommittee |
2019-02-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Cities & Villages Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-12022 | New Code | See Bill Text |
65 | 5 | 11-13-28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1612&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1612.htm |