IL HB1608 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Provides that owners and operators of CCR surface impoundments at electric generating plants that are bordering Lake Michigan shall close the CCR surface impoundment by removal by off-site disposal, pursuant to specified provisions and requirements. In additional provisions, requires an owner or operator to remove from his or her site, for off-site disposal, all CCR generated by a facility that is not disposed of, treated, stored, or abandoned in a CCR surface impoundment, and remediate all soil and groundwater impacted by that CCR, in accordance with specified requirements. Requires owners or operators to submit specified plans and reports to the Environmental Protection Agency. Provides that an owner or operator shall post with the Agency a performance bond or other security for the purpose of ensuring removal and remediation in accordance with the provisions. Provides that the Agency may enter into such contracts and agreements as it deems necessary to carry out the purposes of the provisions. Provides that neither the State, nor the Director of the Agency, nor any State employee shall be liable for any damages or injuries arising out of or resulting from any action taken under the provisions. Contains other provisions. Contains a severability provision. Effective immediately.
Title
EPA-GREAT LAKES CCR PROTECTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2024-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Abdelnasser Rashid |
2023-03-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-22 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-22 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-03-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kevin John Olickal |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-16 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Faver Dias |
2023-03-14 | House | Removed Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-14 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-14 | House | Chief Co-Sponsor Changed to Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-14 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2023-03-13 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Nabeela Syed |
2023-03-08 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-02 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Janet Yang Rohr |
2023-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lilian Jiménez |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-02-22 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2023-02-21 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Energy & Environment Committee; 016-010-000 |
2023-02-15 | House | Assigned to Energy & Environment Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
415 | 5 | 22.59 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 22.59a | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1608&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1608.htm |