IL HB1599 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-12 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Firearms Concealed Carry Act. Provides that for a new or renewal concealed carry license, the fee shall be $75 (rather than $150), of which $60 (rather than $120) shall be apportioned to the State Police Firearm Services Fund, $5 (rather than $20) shall be apportioned to the Mental Health Reporting Fund, and $10 shall be apportioned to the State Crime Laboratory Fund. Provides that a non-resident applicant for a new license or renewal shall submit $150 (rather than $300) and a licensee requesting a new license shall submit $10 (rather than $75). Effective immediately.
Title
CONCEALED CARRY LICENSE FEES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-12 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lance Yednock |
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney |
2019-02-19 | House | To Firearms and Firearm Safety Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
430 | 66 | 60 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1599&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1599.htm |