IL HB1595 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1003
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 24-0)
Status: Passed on August 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1003
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Act.
Title
EMPLOYMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-31 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 110 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-05-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-21 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-1003 |
2018-08-21 | House | Effective Date August 21, 2018 |
2018-08-21 | House | Governor Approved |
2018-06-29 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2018-05-31 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2018-05-31 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2018-05-31 | House | House Concurs |
2018-05-31 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 House Concurs 110-000-000 |
2018-05-29 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 019-000-000 |
2018-05-28 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-05-25 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 3 |
2018-05-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted; Haine |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Postponed - Labor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Labor |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2018-05-21 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass Labor; 016-000-000 |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Assigned to Labor |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-05-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones |
2018-04-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin |
2018-04-27 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000 |
2018-04-27 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2018-04-26 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi |
2018-04-26 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000 |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart |
2018-04-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-23 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-02-02 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-01 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 105 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |