IL HB1595 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-21 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Minimum Wage Law. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the application of the Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMPLOYMENT-TECH

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-21SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor
2018-05-21SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2018-05-18SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2018
2018-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2018-05-10SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings
2018-05-09SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush
2018-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 10, 2018
2018-05-09SenateDo Pass Labor; 016-000-000
2018-05-08SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2018-05-02SenateAssigned to Labor
2018-05-01SenateReferred to Assignments
2018-05-01SenateFirst Reading
2018-05-01SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine
2018-05-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2018-05-01SenateArrive in Senate
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Laura Fine
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2018-04-27HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Melissa Conyears-Ervin
2018-04-27HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 104-000-000
2018-04-27HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-27HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-26HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Labor & Commerce Committee; 025-000-000
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-25HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Katie Stuart
2018-04-23HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-23HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-02-02HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-02-02HouseFirst Reading
2017-02-01HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
82010515Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback