IL HB1593 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Provides that a person who unlawfully possesses fentanyl commits reckless endangerment of a first responder or coroner by fentanyl exposure if he or she, by any means lawful or unlawful, recklessly performs an act or acts that causes a first responder or coroner bodily harm as a result of exposure to or contact with fentanyl. Provides that a person commits reckless endangerment of a first responder or coroner by fentanyl exposure when he or she unlawfully delivers fentanyl to another that causes bodily harm to a first responder or coroner as a result of exposure to or contact with that fentanyl. Reckless endangerment of a first responder or coroner by fentanyl exposure is a Class 2 felony. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIM CD-FENTANYL EXPOSURE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-05HouseTo Sentencing, Penalities and Criminal Procedure Subcommittee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-11HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Monica Bristow

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-5.03New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback