IL HB1592 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0913
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 27 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-27 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0913
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Mental Health Inpatient Facility Access Act. Requires the Department of Human Services' Division of Mental Health to develop a written, strategic plan that comprehensively addresses improving access to inpatient psychiatric beds in State-operated mental health facilities for individuals needing a hospital level of care. Provides that the plan shall include annual training requirements for State-operated inpatient mental health facility clinicians, regular and periodic mental health assessments of individuals admitted to State-operated facilities, updated facility policies and procedures aimed at increasing opportunities for home visits and work programs that assist with community reintegration, steps to increase access to community-based mental health services that provide outpatient alternatives and step-down services, certification requirements for mental health clinicians, and other matters. Requires the Department to develop benchmarks to ensure that every individual found unfit to stand trial or not guilty by reason of insanity who has been committed by a court to the Department for treatment shall be admitted to a Department facility within specified statutory time periods. Requires the strategic plan to be made publicly available in one year. Prohibits the Department from making further reductions in State-operated inpatient mental health bed capacity. Provides that nothing in the amendatory Act shall affect the authority of the Governor to issue emergency executive orders to protect the health or safety of recipients or employees of State-operated inpatient psychiatric facilities. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Conroy [D] | Rep. Kathleen Willis [D] | Rep. Ann Williams [D] | Rep. Margaret Croke [D] |
Rep. Terra Costa Howard [D] | Rep. Michael Kelly [D] | Rep. Jonathan Carroll [D] | Sen. Laura Fine [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-27 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0913 |
2022-05-27 | House | Effective Date May 27, 2022 |
2022-05-27 | House | Governor Approved |
2022-05-05 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 048-000-000 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 6, 2022 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Do Pass Behavioral and Mental Health; 006-000-000 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Laura Fine |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Assigned to Behavioral and Mental Health |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-30 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Margaret Croke |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2022-03-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Kelly |
2022-03-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2022-03-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2022-03-24 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Mental Health & Addiction Committee; 016-000-000 |
2022-03-15 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Mental Health & Addiction Committee |
2022-03-14 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-09 | House | Remove Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-09 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Deb Conroy |
2022-03-09 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) March 31, 2022 |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-03-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2021-04-20 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2021-03-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-02 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-02-17 | House | First Reading |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |