IL HB1592 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-30 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Prevailing Wage Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning State policy.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMPLOYMENT-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-30HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-23HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2018-04-17HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. André Thapedi
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Juliana Stratton
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Litesa E. Wallace
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2018-04-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll
2018-04-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted - Lost Labor & Commerce Committee; 012-015-000
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Christian L. Mitchell
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2018-04-10HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2018-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2018-04-10HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Labor & Commerce Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-09HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Theresa Mah
2018-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-09HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Theresa Mah
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
8201301Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback