IL HB1579 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Enrolled on May 30 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-30 - Passed Both Houses
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that before a sentencing order is entered by the court for a minor adjudged delinquent for disorderly conduct by transmitting or causing to be transmitted in any manner a threat of destruction of a school building or school property, or a threat of violence, death, or bodily harm directed against persons at a school, school function, or school event, whether or not school is in session, in which the minor made a threat of violence, death, or bodily harm against a person, school, school function, or school event, the court shall order a mental health evaluation of the minor by a physician, clinical psychologist, or qualified examiner, whether employed by the State, by any public or private mental health facility or part of the facility, or by any public or private medical facility or part of the facility. Provides that a statement made by a minor during the course of a mental health evaluation conducted under the Act is not admissible on the issue of delinquency during the course of an adjudicatory hearing held under the Act. Amends the Criminal Code of 2012 concerning disorderly conduct. Provides that the threat may be made in any manner. Provides that reimbursement by the defendant for the costs of an emergency response to a school does not apply if the court determines that the defendant is indigent.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DISORDERLY CONDUCT-SCHL-MINOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-30HousePassed Both Houses
2019-05-30HouseHouse Concurs
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 115-000-000
2019-05-30HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000
2019-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-22HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-05-21HouseSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-17SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2019-05-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2
2019-05-17HouseArrived in House
2019-05-16SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019
2019-05-08SenateDo Pass as Amended Criminal Law; 010-000-000
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law
2019-05-06SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Criminal Law
2019-04-11SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-11SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-04-11SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-11SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-11HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-04-11HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-04-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-10HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John M. Cabello
2019-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 013-000-000
2019-04-02HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-26HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 019-000-000
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
7054055-705Amended CodeCitation Text
720526-1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1579&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1579.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1579eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1579enr.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1579ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1579sam001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1579sam002.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB1579_04112019_044000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/senate/10100HB1579_05162019_027000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB1579sam002_05302019_059001C.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/101/house/10100HB1579sam001_05302019_059000C.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback