IL HB1576 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Creates the Downstate Police Pension Investment Board and the Downstate Firefighter Pension Investment Board. Moves the investment authority of downstate police and firefighter pension funds to those Investment Boards. Includes provisions relating to the transfer and investment of the affected assets, auditing and reporting requirements, and the operation and administration of the Investment Boards. Reduces the amount of training required for trustees of those pension funds. Changes all downstate police and firefighter pension funds to a fiscal year beginning May 1. Doubles the annual compliance fee paid by the funds to the Department of Insurance. Requires the Department of Insurance to impose penalties of up to $2,000 per day for noncompliance with certain provisions relating to the transfer of investment assets. Makes conforming and other changes. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately.
Title
PEN CD-POLICE/FIRE INVESTMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-21 | House | To Pension Reform Subcommittee |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. David McSweeney |
2019-02-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Steven Reick |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Ryan Spain |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
30 | 805 | 8.43 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-101.6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-101.7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-109.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.4a | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-113.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1-136 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 1A-112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 1A-113 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-108.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-113.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-113.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-113.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22B-115.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-103 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-108 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-108.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-109 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-112 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-113 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-113.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-113.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-113.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-114 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-115 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 22C-115.5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 3-125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-127 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-132 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-135 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 3-135.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 3-135.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 4-118 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-120 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-123 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-128 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 4-128.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | 4-128.2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | Art. 22B heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 5 | Art. 22C heading | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1576&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HB/10100HB1576.htm |