IL HB1569 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Pension Code. Merges all Article 3 police pension funds into a single Downstate Police Pension Fund on January 1, 2021. Creates a Transition Board, which is responsible for planning, overseeing, and administering the consolidation. Authorizes the Transition Board to undertake numerous activities necessary for the consolidation, including making arrangements for staff, investments, transfer of assets and liabilities, acquisition of property, establishment of municipality accounts, and adopting rules and procedures. Authorizes the Transition Board to enter into contracts and to obligate and expend the assets of the Fund. Creates a new Board of Trustees for the Fund, and provides for administration of the Fund by the Transition Board until the new Board assumes its duties on January 1, 2022. Provides for investment of the Fund's assets by a custodian chosen by the Board of Trustees. Makes conforming and other changes. Amends the Property Tax Extension Limitation Law (PTELL) of the Property Tax Code to exclude from the definition of "aggregate extension" special purpose extensions made for contributions to the Downstate Police Pension Fund. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement. Effective immediately, except that certain changes to the Illinois Pension Code and the Property Tax Code take effect January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PEN CD-CONSOLIDATE DNST POLICE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-21HouseTo Pension Reform Subcommittee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Personnel & Pensions Committee
2019-02-01HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ryan Spain
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Jim Durkin

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
308058.43New CodeSee Bill Text
3520018-185Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-101Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-101.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-101.2New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-102.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-103Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-103.9New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-104New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-105Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-108.2Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-108.3Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-110Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-110.7Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-125Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-125.1Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-128Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-128.1New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-128.2New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-134Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-135Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-140.5New CodeSee Bill Text
4053-141Amended CodeCitation Text
4053-141aNew CodeSee Bill Text
4053-141bNew CodeSee Bill Text
4053-141cNew CodeSee Bill Text
4053-141dNew CodeSee Bill Text
4057-199.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback