IL HB1561 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the School Safety Drill Act. Requires all school boards of school districts to develop threat assessment protocols and to create threat assessment teams. Provides that the threat assessment team shall include specified personnel and other members. Provides that a threat assessment protocol adopted by the school board shall be a public document and be posted on the school district's website. Provides that a school board shall create the threat assessment team within 30 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act and adopt an initial threat assessment protocol within 90 days after the effective date of the amendatory Act. Provides that a school district may share information concerning a clear and present danger with another school district and creates a conforming exemption in the Illinois School Student Records Act. Creates exemptions for the work of the threat assessment team in the Open Meetings Act and the Freedom of Information Act. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SCH THREAT ASSESSMENT PROTOCOL

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-17SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019
2019-05-16SenateSecond Reading
2019-05-09SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019
2019-05-09SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2019-05-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-05-07SenateAdded as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-05-03SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-05-01SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-04-24SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-04-12SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-04-12SenateFirst Reading
2019-04-12SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-04-12SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2019-04-12SenateArrive in Senate
2019-04-12HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000
2019-04-03HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-04-03HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-03-28HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000
2019-03-28HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-03-13HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli
2019-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-02-21HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
105106Amended CodeCitation Text
10512845New CodeSee Bill Text
51202Amended CodeCitation Text
51407Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback