IL HB1561 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-3)
Status: Passed on August 26 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0455
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that counties may impose a tax to be used exclusively for school facility purposes, school resources officers, or mental health professionals (rather than exclusively for school facility purposes). Adds referendum language to levy, reduce, or discontinue the tax. Amends the Innovation Development and Economy Act and the School Construction Law to make conforming changes. Amends the School Code to make conforming changes and to provide that if a school district having a population of less than 500,000 inhabitants determines that it is necessary for school security purposes and the related protection and safety of pupils and school staff to hire a school resource officer or that personnel costs for school counselors, mental health experts, or school resource officers are necessary, the district may levy a tax or issue bonds as provided under a provision in the Code authorizing a school board to levy a tax or to borrow money and issue bonds for fire prevention, safety, energy conservation, accessibility, school security, and specified repair purposes if funds are not needed for those other purposes. Amends the School Safety Drill Act. Requires each school district to implement a threat assessment procedure that may be part of a school board policy on targeted school violence and prevention and that must include the creation of a threat assessment team; provides for the team's membership. Requires each school district, at its annual meeting to review each school building's emergency and crisis response plans, protocols, and procedures, to review the procedures regarding its threat assessment team. Creates an exemption for the work of the threat assessment team in the Freedom of Information Act. Effective immediately.
Title
SCH THREAT ASSESSMENT PROTOCOL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-30 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-12 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 109 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-26 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0455 |
2019-08-26 | House | Effective Date August 26, 2019 |
2019-08-26 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-28 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-30 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark Batinick |
2019-05-30 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-30 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-30 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 116-000-000 |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-05-27 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 016-000-000 |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Rules Referred to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1, 2 |
2019-05-23 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; T. Cullerton |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 17, 2019 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-12 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 109-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; 019-000-000 |
2019-03-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee; by Voice Vote |
2019-03-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-03-13 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Grant Wehrli |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-02-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Tony McCombie |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Elementary & Secondary Education: School Curriculum & Policies Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Fred Crespo |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 10 | 6 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
105 | 128 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text |
5 | 120 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |