IL HB1560 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Designations Act. Repeals English as the official State language of Illinois.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

DESIGNATIONS-STATE LANGUAGE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-30HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
546020Repealed CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback