IL HB1557 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-12 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0053
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall provide a pamphlet or post information informing customers of the availability of literacy and English as a second language classes at the Secretary of State Driver Service facilities. Provides that the Secretary may satisfy the requirement by providing the Internet address of a not-for-profit entity offering this information.
Title
SOS-LITERACY & ENGLISH CLASSES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 76 N: 28 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-12 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0053 |
2019-07-12 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-07-12 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-16 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 049-000-000 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 7, 2019 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 013-000-000 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 4, 2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-03-28 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 076-028-001 |
2019-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-12 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen |
2019-03-07 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 010-002-000 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-30 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |