IL HB1551 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0237
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Children and Family Services Act. Provides that whenever a child is placed in the custody or guardianship of the Department of Children and Family Services or a child is returned to the custody of a parent or guardian and the court retains jurisdiction of the case, the Department must ensure that the child is up to date on his or her well-child visits, including age-appropriate immunizations, or that there is a documented religious or medical reason the child did not receive the immunizations. Provides that whenever a child has been placed in foster or substitute care by court order and the court later determines that the child can return to the custody of his or her parent or guardian, the Department must complete, prior to the child's discharge from foster or substitute care, a home safety checklist to ensure that the conditions of the child's home are sufficient to ensure the child's safety and well-being, as defined in Department rules and procedures. Provides that at a minimum, the home safety checklist shall be completed within 24 hours prior to the child's return home and completed again or recertified in the absence of any environmental barriers or hazards within 5 working days after a child is returned home and every month thereafter until the child's case is closed pursuant to the Juvenile Court Act of 1987. Provides that when a court determines that a child should return to the custody or guardianship of a parent or guardian, any aftercare services provided to the child and the child's family by the Department or a purchase of service agency shall commence on the date upon which the child is returned to the custody or guardianship of his or her parent or guardian. If multiple children are returned at different times to the custody or guardianship of the parent or guardian, requires aftercare services to commence on the date upon which the last child returns home. Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that when a report is made by a mandated reporter to the statewide toll-free telephone number established under the Act and there is a prior indicated report of abuse or neglect and a prior open service case involving any member of the household, the Department must, at a minimum, accept the report as a child welfare services referral. Requires a child protective services investigation if the family refuses to cooperate or refuses access to the home or children and if the facts otherwise meet the criteria to accept a report. Provides that beginning one year after the effective date of the amendatory Act, and every 2 years thereafter, the Auditor General shall conduct a performance and compliance audit of the Department of Children and Family Services to determine whether the Department is meeting the requirements under the amendatory Act. Provides that upon completion of each audit, the Auditor General shall report its findings to the General Assembly. Requires the Auditor General's report to include any issues or deficiencies and recommendations.
Title
JUV CT-FAMILY SUPPORT PROGRAM
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-29 - House - Concurrence in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-09 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0237 |
2019-08-09 | House | Effective Date January 1, 2020 |
2019-08-09 | House | Governor Approved |
2019-06-27 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2019-05-29 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2019-05-29 | House | House Concurs |
2019-05-29 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 House Concurs 115-000-000 |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-20 | House | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Added as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2019-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1 |
2019-05-17 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 14, 2019 |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 9, 2019 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 007-000-000 |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Human Services |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-04-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Julie A. Morrison |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2019-04-04 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2019-04-04 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-04-04 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-04-03 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 009-000-000 |
2019-04-02 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-03-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-03-21 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Sue Scherer |
2019-03-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith P. Sommer |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-03-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2019-02-19 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Adoption & Child Welfare Committee; 013-000-000 |
2019-02-19 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to Adoption & Child Welfare Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading |
2019-01-29 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1705 | 7.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
705 | 405 | 5-711 | New Code | See Bill Text |