IL HB1542 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-29 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Trusts and Trustees Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Act's short title.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CIVIL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-29HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Rules Committee
2017-05-28HouseSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed Concur Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-05-28HousePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence Senate Amendment(s) 1
2017-05-28HouseArrived in House
2017-05-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2017-05-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading
2017-05-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Schimpf
2017-05-26SenateRecalled to Second Reading
2017-05-25SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 005-000-000
2017-05-24SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-05-23SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-05-19SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 22, 2017
2017-05-19SenateSecond Reading
2017-05-16SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 17, 2017
2017-05-16SenateDo Pass Revenue; 006-000-000
2017-05-12SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 19, 2017
2017-05-11SenateAlternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-05-11SenateSponsor Removed Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-05-11SenateAdded as Alternate Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Schimpf
2017-05-04SenatePostponed - Revenue
2017-04-25SenateAssigned to Revenue
2017-04-06SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-06SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-06SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2017-04-06SenateArrive in Senate
2017-04-05HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000
2017-04-04HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2017-04-04HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-31HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. David B. Reis
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2017-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Judiciary - Civil Committee; by Voice Vote
2017-03-29HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
2017-03-28HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-28HouseMotion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed
2017-03-28HouseMotion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Judiciary - Civil Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie
2017-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-27HouseRe-assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2017-03-24HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Brandon W. Phelps
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
76051Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback