IL HB1534 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Repeals a provision which specifies that the office of county treasurer shall become vacant if, in certain circumstances, the county treasurer neglects or refuses to render an account or make settlement at any time when required by law, refuses to answer any question regarding the operation of the county treasurer's office propounded by the county board, or refuses to provide the county board with any requested information concerning the accounts maintained by the county treasurer's office. Provides that the office of county treasurer shall become vacant if the county treasurer dies or resigns or the office otherwise becomes vacant.
Title
COUNTIES-TREASURER VACANCY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | House | Session Sine Die |
2023-03-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to Ethics & Elections |
2023-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2023-01-27 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Lawrence "Larry" Walsh, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 3-10020 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1534&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HB/10300HB1534.htm |