IL HB1533 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 15 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-15 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0065
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Personnel Code. Provides that employees of the Sentencing Policy Advisory Council are exempt from the provisions of the Code. Amends the Unified Code of Corrections. Expands the membership of the Council. Effective immediately.
Title
SENTENCING POLICY ADV COUNCIL
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-14 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-15 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0065 |
2013-07-15 | House | Effective Date July 15, 2013 |
2013-07-15 | House | Governor Approved |
2013-05-16 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-14 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 9, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 2, 2013 |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 11, 2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2013-04-09 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-000-000 |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-04-08 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-03-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Personnel and Pensions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Personnel and Pensions Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-03-11 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-03-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-02-08 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 415 | 4c | Amended Code | Citation Text |
730 | 5 | 5-8-8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |