IL HB1531 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-21 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0085
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates the Illinois Parentage Act of 2015. Provides methods for the establishment of a parent-child relationship. Authorizes genetic testing. Provides for temporary relief and proceedings to adjudicate parentage. Establishes procedures regarding parentage of a child of assisted reproduction. Provides for child support establishment and enforcement. Repeals the Illinois Parentage Act and the Illinois Parentage Act of 1984. Amends numerous Acts to make conforming changes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PARENTAGE ACT OF 2015

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 35 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 65 N: 50 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-07-21HousePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0085
2015-07-21HouseEffective Date January 1, 2016
2015-07-21HouseGovernor Approved
2015-06-17HouseSent to the Governor
2015-05-19HousePassed Both Houses
2015-05-19SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a)
2015-05-19SenateThird Reading - Passed; 035-019-001
2015-05-14SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015
2015-05-14SenateSecond Reading
2015-05-13SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 14, 2015
2015-05-13SenateDo Pass Judiciary; 010-000-000
2015-05-12SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8(b-1), the following amendment will remain in the Committee on Assignments
2015-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2015-05-07SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe
2015-05-06SenatePostponed - Judiciary
2015-04-29SenateAssigned to Judiciary
2015-04-28SenateReferred to Assignments
2015-04-28SenateFirst Reading
2015-04-23SenateChief Senate Sponsor Sen. John G. Mulroe
2015-04-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of First Reading
2015-04-23SenateArrive in Senate
2015-04-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 065-050-000
2015-04-22HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Adopted
2015-04-22HouseRecalled to Second Reading - Short Debate
2015-04-22HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Civil Committee; 010-000-000
2015-04-21HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2015-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2015-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-20HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2015-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2015-04-14HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2015-03-17HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-17HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-13HousePension Note Filed
2015-03-12HouseJudicial Note Filed
2015-03-12HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Filed
2015-03-12HousePension Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis
2015-03-12HouseJudicial Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis
2015-03-12HouseState Mandates Fiscal Note Requested by Rep. David B. Reis
2015-03-10HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-10HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-04HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2015-03-04HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 009-002-000
2015-02-24HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2015-02-06HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2015-02-06HouseFirst Reading
2015-02-06HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Kelly M. Burke

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2010051005-130Amended CodeCitation Text
20100543a.14Amended CodeCitation Text
2021052105-15Amended CodeCitation Text
2025052505-65Amended CodeCitation Text
20250539b12Amended CodeCitation Text
2254252.04Amended CodeCitation Text
305510-16.7Amended CodeCitation Text
305510-17Amended CodeCitation Text
305510-17.7Amended CodeCitation Text
305510-19Amended CodeCitation Text
305510-25Amended CodeCitation Text
305510-25.5Amended CodeCitation Text
305510-27Amended CodeCitation Text
305510-3.1Amended CodeCitation Text
305512-4.7cAmended CodeCitation Text
41051322Amended CodeCitation Text
41051330Amended CodeCitation Text
41053512Amended CodeCitation Text
41053524Amended CodeCitation Text
5553-5036.5Amended CodeCitation Text
62552-109.1Amended CodeCitation Text
62557-703Amended CodeCitation Text
70510527.1aAmended CodeCitation Text
7054051-3Amended CodeCitation Text
7054056-9Amended CodeCitation Text
7255112A-14Amended CodeCitation Text
73053-5-4Amended CodeCitation Text
735512-112Amended CodeCitation Text
735512-819Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-1401Amended CodeCitation Text
73552-209Amended CodeCitation Text
74017011Amended CodeCitation Text
7501650Amended CodeCitation Text
75022101Amended CodeCitation Text
75022102Amended CodeCitation Text
750256Amended CodeCitation Text
7502815Amended CodeCitation Text
75040ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
75045ActRepealed CodeCitation Text
7504735Amended CodeCitation Text
7505713Amended CodeCitation Text
750501Amended CodeCitation Text
7505012aAmended CodeCitation Text
7505018.06Amended CodeCitation Text
750508Amended CodeCitation Text
75060202Amended CodeCitation Text
75060214Amended CodeCitation Text
80518050-5Amended CodeCitation Text
80551.25Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1531&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=88&GA=99
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB1531.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB1531eng.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB1531enr.htm
Texthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/publicacts/99/099-0085.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB1531ham001.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB1531ham002.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB1531ham003.htm
Amendmenthttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HB/09900HB1531sam001.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/house/09900HB1531_04232015_002000T.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.ilga.gov/legislation/votehistory/99/senate/09900HB1531_05192015_014000T.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback