IL HB1494 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Appropriates $5,000,000 from the Build Illinois Bond Fund to the Illinois Community College Board for a grant to the City Colleges of Chicago for all costs associated with the construction and renovation of the City of Chicago Career and Technical Education Center. Effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

$GRANTS-ICCB-CITY COLLEGES

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-26HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2023-02-28HouseAssigned to Appropriations-Higher Education Committee
2023-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2023-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2023-01-26HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback