IL HB1490 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0338
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0338
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Young Adult Community State Employment Plan Act. Contains a Purposes Section. Defines terms. Provides that the Department of Central Management Services shall: develop and implement plans to increase the number of young adult community members employed by State government, including those at supervisory, technical, professional, and managerial levels; prepare a Young Adult Community State Employment Plan; annually report to the General Assembly each State agency's activities that implement the Plan; and assist State agencies with training programs to meet their affirmative action and equal employment opportunity goals. Provides that each State agency shall implement programs under the Plan to increase the number of young adult community members employed by the State and report annually to the Department its activities that implement the Plan. Creates the Young Adult Community State Employment Plan Advisory Council, consisting of 11 members appointed by the Governor, each of whom shall be a subject matter expert on the young adult community. Provides that members shall serve without compensation, but shall be reimbursed for reasonable expenses from appropriated funds. Includes other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
YOUNG ADULT STATE EMPLOYMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-19 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 38 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-15 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 79 N: 36 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-11 | House | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0338 |
2015-08-11 | House | Effective Date August 11, 2015 |
2015-08-11 | House | Governor Approved |
2015-06-17 | House | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-19 | House | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 038-013-000 |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 18, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Added as Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 12, 2015 |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Do Pass State Government and Veterans Affairs; 006-003-000 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-04-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chief Senate Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading April 16, 2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Arrive in Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-04-15 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-04-15 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 079-036-000 |
2015-03-27 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-25 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 40 |
2015-03-19 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Youth & Young Adults; 007-005-000 |
2015-03-19 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Adopted in Youth & Young Adults; by Voice Vote |
2015-03-17 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Youth & Young Adults |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-16 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-03-10 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Youth & Young Adults |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-03-09 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to Youth & Young Adults |
2015-02-06 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-06 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |