IL HB1483 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Prohibits a child sex offender from knowingly operating, managing, being employed by, or being associated with the Illinois State Fair or DuQuoin State Fair (in addition to a county fair), when persons under the age of 18 are present. Provides that a violation is a Class 4 felony.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

SEX OFFENDER-NO STATE FAIR

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Andrew S. Chesney
2019-03-25HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Darren Bailey
2019-02-21HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael Halpin
2019-02-19HouseTo Sex Offenses and Sex Offender Registration Subcommittee
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Tony McCombie

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720511-9.3Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback