IL HB1483 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Food Handling Regulation Enforcement Act. Provides that, notwithstanding any other provision of law, neither the Department of Public Health nor the health department of a unit of local government may regulate the serving or sale of food at a charitable fundraising event or at a farmers market.
Title
FOOD-FUNDRAISING-FARMERS MRKT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2011-04-15 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2011-04-14 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-04-14 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2011-03-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Naomi D. Jakobsson |
2011-02-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2011-02-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; 011-000-000 |
2011-02-15 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2011-02-14 | House | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Chapin Rose |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 625 | 3.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
410 | 625 | 3.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1483&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HB/09700HB1483.htm |