IL HB1474 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-1)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - House Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Officials and Employees Ethics Act. Provides for specified rights of complainants under the Act. Defines terms. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ETHICS-RIGHTS OF COMPLAINANTS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-29HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-28HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-27HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-27HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-26HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-03-15HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary Edly-Allen
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr.
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-03-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Thaddeus Jones
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Yehiel M. Kalish
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Karina Villa
2019-03-13HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield
2019-03-06HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 To Constitutional Law Subcommittee
2019-03-06HouseRemoved Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-03-05HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-02-26HouseAdded Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Sonya M. Harper
2019-02-26HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-02-20HouseTo Constitutional Law Subcommittee
2019-02-14HouseAdded Co-Sponsor Rep. Margo McDermed
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee
2019-02-01HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading
2019-01-29HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Anne Stava-Murray

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
54301-5Amended CodeCitation Text
54305-70New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback