IL HB1472 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning piercing the body of a minor.
Title
CRIMINAL LAW-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2018-04-27 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-26 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000 |
2018-04-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-17 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-16 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer |
2018-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2018-04-10 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2018-04-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2018-04-09 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000 |
2018-04-05 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2017-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-04-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate ** |
2017-03-29 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 |
2017-03-22 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-01-31 | House | First Reading |
2017-01-31 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
720 | 5 | 12-10.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
720 | 5 | 12C-40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |