IL HB1472 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-27 - Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Criminal Code of 2012. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning piercing the body of a minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

CRIMINAL LAW-TECH

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-27HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-26HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Judiciary - Criminal Committee; 008-004-000
2018-04-19HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-17HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Filed as Amended
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Correctional Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-16HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Tom Demmer
2018-04-11HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2018-04-10HouseHouse Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield
2018-04-09HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2018-04-09HouseApproved for Consideration Rules Committee; 004-000-000
2018-04-05HouseChief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Rita Mayfield
2017-04-28HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2017-04-27HouseHeld on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate **
2017-04-27HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2017-03-29HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate **
2017-03-29HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000
2017-03-22HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2017-01-31HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-01-31HouseFirst Reading
2017-01-31HouseFiled with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Madigan

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
720512-10.1Amended CodeCitation Text
720512C-40Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback